MN HF3103 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-16 - Authors added Demuth and Cantrell
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-16 - Authors added Demuth and Cantrell
Pending: Senate Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Minnesota Human Rights Act race definition added.
Title
Minnesota Human Rights Act race definition added.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-15 - House - House: CALENDAR FOR THE DAY (Y: 92 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-16 | House | Authors added Demuth and Cantrell |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2020-05-15 | Senate | Received from House |
2020-05-15 | House | Author added Bernardy |
2020-05-15 | House | Bill was passed |
2020-05-15 | House | Third reading |
2020-05-13 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Friday, May 15, 2020 |
2020-03-09 | House | Second reading |
2020-03-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2020-03-04 | House | Authors added Noor and Moller |
2020-02-26 | House | Author added Kunesh-Podein |
2020-02-18 | House | Author added Lillie |
2020-02-17 | House | Author added Lee |
2020-02-17 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SF4038 (Similar To) 2020-03-05 - Referred to Judiciary and Public Safety Finance and Policy