MN HF3097 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Author added Scott and Boe
Pending: House State Government Finance and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Author added Scott and Boe
Pending: House State Government Finance and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Voters registering on election day required to cast provisions ballots, and conforming changes made.
Title
Voters registering on election day required to cast provisions ballots, and conforming changes made.
Sponsors
Rep. Kurt Daudt [R] | Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] | Rep. Dale Lueck [R] | Rep. Matt Bliss [R] |
Rep. Gregory Davids [R] | Rep. Susan Akland [R] | Rep. Peggy Bennett [R] | Rep. Peggy Scott [R] |
Rep. Greg Boe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Author added Scott and Boe |
2022-03-10 | House | Author added Bennett |
2022-02-24 | House | Author added Akland |
2022-02-17 | House | Author added Davids |
2022-02-10 | House | Authors added Dettmer, Lueck and Bliss |
2022-02-03 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to State Government Finance and Elections |