MN HF3090 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - Author added Bernardy
Pending: House Human Services Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - Author added Bernardy
Pending: House Human Services Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Emergency shelter facility grant funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Emergency shelter facility grant funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | Author added Bernardy |
2022-03-14 | House | Authors added Olson, L.; Hanson, J.; Hornstein |
2022-03-10 | House | Authors added Christensen, Elkins, Long, and Hansen, R. |
2022-03-03 | House | Author added Lillie |
2022-02-21 | House | Motion to recall and re-refer, motion prevailed Human Services Finance and Policy |
2022-02-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Housing Finance and Policy |
2022-02-03 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Preventing Homelessness Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF3140 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Author added Pappas