MN HF3079 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Disabilities added to focus of health disparities, and populations added to community grants targeting health disparities.
Title
Disabilities added to focus of health disparities, and populations added to community grants targeting health disparities.
Sponsors
Rep. Ruth Richardson [D] | Rep. Shelly Christensen [D] | Rep. Jamie Becker-finn [D] | Rep. Heather Edelson [D] |
Rep. Michael Howard [D] | Rep. John Huot [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Second reading |
2020-03-09 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2020-02-24 | House | Author added Huot |
2020-02-13 | House | Author added Howard |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2947 (Similar To) 2020-02-11 - Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy