MN HF3075 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Author added Sandell
Pending: House Commerce Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-07 - Author added Sandell
Pending: House Commerce Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Products containing PFAS disclosure notice required, and rulemaking required.
Title
Products containing PFAS disclosure notice required, and rulemaking required.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Author added Sandell |
2022-03-07 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Commerce Finance and Policy |
2022-02-24 | House | Author added Hollins |
2022-02-14 | House | Author added Her |
2022-02-03 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3326 (Similar To) 2022-03-31 - Author added Newton