MN HF3072 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Second reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Smoking prohibited in passenger vehicles and public transportation vehicles with persons under age 18 present, and violation fine established.
Title
Smoking prohibited in passenger vehicles and public transportation vehicles with persons under age 18 present, and violation fine established.
Sponsors
Rep. Rena Moran [D] | Rep. Laurie Halverson [D] | Rep. Heather Edelson [D] | Rep. Hodan Hassan [D] |
Rep. Ginny Klevorn [D] | Rep. Jamie Long [D] | Rep. Dave Pinto [D] | Sen. Kelly Morrison [D] |
Rep. John Huot [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | House | Second reading |
2020-03-05 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2020-02-27 | House | Author added Huot |
2020-02-27 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Transportation Finance and Policy Division |
2020-02-26 | House | Author added Morrison |
2020-02-20 | House | Author added Pinto |
2020-02-19 | House | Author added Long |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3276 (Similar To) 2020-02-17 - Referred to Transportation Finance and Policy