MN HF3068 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Author added Her
Pending: Senate State Government Finance and Policy and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Author added Her
Pending: Senate State Government Finance and Policy and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Voter data access related to presidential nomination primary regulated, and voters allowed to request that their data be excluded from the lists.
Title
Voter data access related to presidential nomination primary regulated, and voters allowed to request that their data be excluded from the lists.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - House - House: Passage (Y: 72 N: 55 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Scott - Amendment - H3068A5 (Y: 56 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Scott - Amendment - H3068DE1 (Y: 35 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Scott - Amendment - H3068A5 (Y: 56 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-26 - House - House: Scott - Amendment - H3068DE1 (Y: 35 N: 90 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Author added Her |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Referred to State Government Finance and Policy and Elections |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Received from House |
2020-02-27 | House | Author added Brand |
2020-02-26 | House | Bill was passed as amended |
2020-02-26 | House | Third reading as amended |
2020-02-26 | House | Amended |
2020-02-24 | House | Author added Stephenson |
2020-02-24 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, February 26, 2020 |
2020-02-20 | House | Second reading |
2020-02-20 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2020-02-19 | House | Authors added Masin and Lillie |
2020-02-19 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2020-02-17 | House | Authors added Noor; Wolgamott; Xiong. J; and Wazlawik |
2020-02-13 | House | Authors added Youakim, Pinto, Hornstein, and Hausman |
2020-02-13 | House | Returned by Chair to Government Operations |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred by Chair to Subcommittee on Elections |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SF2986 (Similar To) 2020-02-17 - Author added Latz