MN HF3060 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-15 - Author added Cantrell
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-15 - Author added Cantrell
Pending: House Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Local government; certain contracts prohibited.
Title
Local government; certain contracts prohibited.
Sponsors
Rep. Fue Lee [D] | Rep. Aisha Gomez [D] | Rep. Kaohly Her [D] | Sen. Alice Mann [D] |
Rep. Raymond Dehn [D] | Rep. Hodan Hassan [D] | Rep. Mohamud Noor [D] | Rep. Rena Moran [D] |
Rep. Tim Mahoney [D] | Rep. Alice Hausman [D] | Rep. Mike Freiberg [D] | Rep. Kelly Moller [D] |
Rep. Jay Xiong [D] | Rep. Jim Davnie [D] | Rep. Robert Bierman [D] | Rep. Michael Howard [D] |
Rep. Cheryl Youakim [D] | Rep. Jamie Long [D] | Rep. Hunter Cantrell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-15 | House | Author added Cantrell |
2020-02-20 | House | Referred by Chair to Government Operations |
2020-02-19 | House | Author added Long |
2020-02-13 | House | Author added Youakim |
2020-02-11 | House | Referred by Chair to Subcommittee on Local Government |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SF2973 (Similar To) 2020-02-11 - Referred to Local Government