MN HF306 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Author added Dettmer
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Health plan coverage for treatment of pediatric autoimmune neuropsychiatric disorders associated with streptococcal infections and pediatric acute-onset neuropsychiatric syndrome, and reports required.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health plan coverage for treatment of pediatric autoimmune neuropsychiatric disorders associated with streptococcal infections and pediatric acute-onset neuropsychiatric syndrome, and reports required.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-01HouseAuthor added Dettmer
2019-03-28HouseAuthors added Bierman and O'Driscoll
2019-03-27HouseAuthors added Wolgamott, Edelson, Huot, and Cantrell
2019-03-21HouseAuthors added Winkler, Poston, Bennett, Backer, and Hamilton
2019-03-15HouseReferred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
2019-03-14HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
2019-03-13HouseAuthor added Elkins
2019-03-04HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Policy
2019-01-31HouseAuthor added Halverson
2019-01-24HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Commerce

Same As/Similar To

SF2346 (Similar To) 2019-03-28 - Authors added Latz; Cwodzinski

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback