MN HF3058 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-16 - Author added Jordan
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Policy Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Air quality permit; requirement to analyze and consider cumulative pollution modified before issuing permit, and community liaison position required.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Air quality permit; requirement to analyze and consider cumulative pollution modified before issuing permit, and community liaison position required.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-16HouseAuthor added Jordan
2020-02-24HouseAuthor added Huot
2020-02-19HouseAuthor added Long
2020-02-13HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Environment and Natural Resources Finance Division
2020-02-11HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF3433 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Referred to Environment and Natural Resources Policy and Legacy Finance

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback