MN HF3013 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-4)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-10 - Author added Jessup.
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Teacher training required to enable a teacher to implement instructional strategies to meet the needs of students with dyslexia.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Teacher training required to enable a teacher to implement instructional strategies to meet the needs of students with dyslexia.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-10HouseAuthor added Jessup.
2018-04-12HouseAuthors added Pierson and Rosenthal.
2018-03-15HouseAuthor added Jurgens.
2018-03-12HouseAuthor added Daniels.
2018-03-08HouseAuthors added Poston and McDonald.
2018-03-08HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Education Finance
2018-03-05HouseAuthor added Pugh.
2018-03-05HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Government Operations and Elections Policy
2018-03-01HouseAuthors added Dettmer, Maye Quade, Bennett, Haley, Erickson, Thissen, and Smith.
2018-02-26HouseAuthors added Bliss, Gruenhagen, and Lohmer.
2018-02-22HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Education Innovation Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF2455 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Author added Hoffman

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback