MN HF3012 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-08 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-08 - HF indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Electronic location tracking warrant information reporting enabled.
Title
Electronic location tracking warrant information reporting enabled.
Sponsors
Rep. John Lesch [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | HF indefinitely postponed |
2020-05-07 | House | Bills not identical, SF substituted on General Register |
2020-05-05 | House | Referred to Chief Clerk for comparison with SF3072 |
2020-02-20 | House | Second reading |
2020-02-20 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF3072 (Similar To) 2020-05-16 - Secretary of State, Filed