MN HF3010 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Author added Hornstein.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Author added Hornstein.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Pharmacist penalties prohibited for sharing certain information with individuals.
Title
Pharmacist penalties prohibited for sharing certain information with individuals.
Sponsors
Rep. Roz Peterson [R] | Rep. Rod Hamilton [R] | Rep. Nick Zerwas [R] | Sen. Glenn Gruenhagen [R] |
Rep. Mike Freiberg [D] | Rep. Tim Miller [R] | Rep. Peggy Flanagan [D] | Rep. Frank Hornstein [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Author added Hornstein. |
2018-03-22 | House | Author added Flanagan. |
2018-03-01 | House | Author added Miller. |
2018-02-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF2599 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Author added Wiklund