MN HF3009 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Motion prevailed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-02 - Motion prevailed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Unmanned aerial vehicle use by law enforcement agencies regulated, and data classified.
Title
Unmanned aerial vehicle use by law enforcement agencies regulated, and data classified.
Sponsors
Rep. John Lesch [D] | Rep. Kelly Moller [D] | Rep. Jay Xiong [D] | Sen. Eric Lucero [R] |
Rep. Mohamud Noor [D] | Rep. Peggy Scott [R] | Rep. Hunter Cantrell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-02 | House | Motion prevailed |
2020-03-02 | House | Motion to re-refer Ways and Means |
2020-02-20 | House | Second reading |
2020-02-20 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2020-02-18 | House | Author added Cantrell |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF3074 (Similar To) 2020-02-20 - Author added Latz