MN HF3006 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-21 - Author added Hornstein
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-21 - Author added Hornstein
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Well water testing program provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Well water testing program provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Patty Acomb [D] | Rep. Peter Fischer [D] | Rep. Todd Lippert [D] | Sen. Kelly Morrison [D] |
Rep. Emma Greenman [D] | Rep. Frank Hornstein [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-21 | House | Author added Hornstein |
2022-04-04 | House | Author added Greenman |
2022-02-16 | House | Division action, return to Health Finance and Policy |
2022-02-03 | House | Referred by Chair to Preventive Health Policy Division |
2022-02-03 | House | Author stricken Heintzeman |
2022-02-01 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3117 (Similar To) 2022-03-24 - Author added Senjem