MN HF3 | 2020 | 91st Legislature 2nd Special Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on July 13 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-07-20 - Authors added Bernardy; Sandell; Carlson, L.; and Masin
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Capital improvement spending authorized to acquire and better public land and buildings and other improvements of a capital nature, previous appropriations modified new programs established and existing program modified, bonds issued, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Capital improvement spending authorized to acquire and better public land and buildings and other improvements of a capital nature, previous appropriations modified new programs established and existing program modified, bonds issued, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-20 - House - House: CALENDAR FOR THE DAY (Y: 75 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - House - House: 75 - Amendment to the Davids Amendment - Nays (Y: 58 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-20HouseAuthors added Bernardy; Sandell; Carlson, L.; and Masin
2020-07-20HouseBill was not passed as amended three-fifths majority required
2020-07-20HouseThird reading as amended
2020-07-20HouseAmended
2020-07-20HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, July 20, 2020
2020-07-14HouseAuthor added Lee
2020-07-14HouseSecond reading
2020-07-14HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2020-07-13HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SF43 (Similar To) 2020-07-20 - By Motion, Laid on Table

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback