MN HF3 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Referred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

OneCare Buy-In through MNsure website established, outpatient prescription drug program established, dental administration governing provisions modified, health care governing provisions modified, and studies and reports required.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

OneCare Buy-In through MNsure website established, outpatient prescription drug program established, dental administration governing provisions modified, health care governing provisions modified, and studies and reports required.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27HouseReferred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
2019-03-27HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
2019-03-18HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Government Operations
2019-03-11HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Commerce
2019-01-10HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF1080 (Similar To) 2019-02-14 - Authors added Marty; Hayden; Eaton; Wiklund

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback