MN HF3 | 2017 | 90th Legislature 1st Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Secretary of State Chapter 3
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Omnibus transportation bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Omnibus transportation bill.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 19 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-24 - House - House: (Y: 74 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-30 Secretary of State Chapter 3
2017-05-30 Governor's action Approval
2017-05-26 Presented to Governor
2017-05-25HouseReturned from Senate
2017-05-25SenateThird reading Passed vote: 38-25
2017-05-25SenateUrgency declared rules suspended
2017-05-25SenateTaken from table
2017-05-25SenateLaid on table
2017-05-25SenateSecond reading
2017-05-25SenateTaken from table
2017-05-24SenateLaid on table
2017-05-24SenateIntroduction and first reading
2017-05-24SenateReceived from House
2017-05-24HouseBill was passed as amended vote: 74-54
2017-05-24HouseThird reading as amended
2017-05-24HouseAmended
2017-05-24HouseMotion prevailed
2017-05-24HouseMotion for reconsideration third reading.
2017-05-24HouseMotion prevailed
2017-05-24HouseMotion to take from table
2017-05-23HouseMotion prevailed
2017-05-23HouseMotion to lay on the table
2017-05-23HouseThird reading
2017-05-23HouseSecond reading
2017-05-23HouseRules suspended, urgency declared
2017-05-23HouseIntroduction and first reading

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback