MN HF2987 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Drug repository program created.
Title
Drug repository program created.
Sponsors
Rep. Debra Kiel [R] | Rep. Jennifer Schultz [D] | Rep. Tony Albright [R] | Rep. Tina Liebling [D] |
Rep. Joe Schomacker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance |
2018-03-22 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance |
2018-03-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy |
2018-02-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF2562 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy