MN HF2982 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-19 - Secretary of State Chapter 140 05/17/18
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-19 - Secretary of State Chapter 140 05/17/18
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
University of Minnesota agricultural research data classified.
Title
University of Minnesota agricultural research data classified.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House: Passage (Y: 126 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House: Passage (Y: 126 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-19 | Secretary of State Chapter 140 05/17/18 | |
2018-05-17 | Governor's action Approval | |
2018-05-17 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2018-05-17 | Governor approval | |
2018-05-14 | Presented to Governor | |
2018-05-10 | House | Returned from Senate |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Third reading Passed vote: 66-0 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Special Order |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Second reading |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF2550 |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF2550, now on General Orders |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Received from House |
2018-03-26 | House | Bill was passed as amended vote: 126-0 |
2018-03-26 | House | Third reading as amended |
2018-03-26 | House | Amended |
2018-03-22 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, March 26, 2018 |
2018-03-15 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, March 19, 2018 |
2018-03-12 | House | Second reading |
2018-03-12 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2018-03-08 | House | Author added Davids. |
2018-03-01 | House | Author added Poppe. |
2018-03-01 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Civil Law and Data Practices Policy |
2018-02-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Agriculture Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2550 (Similar To) 2018-03-29 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF2982