MN HF2975 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Author added Loeffler.
Pending: House Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Author added Loeffler.
Pending: House Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal penalties for peace officers who have sexual relations with persons in custody established.
Title
Criminal penalties for peace officers who have sexual relations with persons in custody established.
Sponsors
Rep. Ilhan Omar [D] | Rep. Raymond Dehn [D] | Rep. Rena Moran [D] | Rep. Leon Lillie [D] |
Rep. Diane Loeffler [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | Author added Loeffler. |
2018-03-05 | House | Author added Lillie. |
2018-02-26 | House | Authors added Dehn, R., and Moran. |
2018-02-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF3009 (Similar To) 2018-03-15 - Author added Kent