MN HF2969 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-21 - Author added Burkel
Pending: House Agriculture Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-21 - Author added Burkel
Pending: House Agriculture Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Grain buyer license requirements modified.
Title
Grain buyer license requirements modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-21 | House | Author added Burkel |
2022-02-17 | House | Author added Nelson, N. |
2022-02-01 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Agriculture Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF4118 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Referred to Agriculture and Rural Development Finance and Policy