MN HF2966 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-30 - Authors changed Halverson shown as chief author
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-30 - Authors changed Halverson shown as chief author
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Family Tree Clinic funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Family Tree Clinic funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Laurie Halverson [D] | Rep. Paul Thissen [D] | Rep. Diane Loeffler [D] | Sen. Erin Murphy [D] |
Rep. Susan Allen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-30 | House | Authors changed Halverson shown as chief author |
2018-04-12 | House | Authors added Allen and Halverson. |
2018-04-09 | House | Author added Murphy, E. |
2018-03-22 | House | Author added Loeffler. |
2018-02-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF2727 (Similar To) 2018-02-26 - Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy