MN HF2962 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-24 - Author added Bernardy.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-24 - Author added Bernardy.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Pharmacists authorized to prescribe tobacco cessation medications, opiate antagonists, and travel medications.
Title
Pharmacists authorized to prescribe tobacco cessation medications, opiate antagonists, and travel medications.
Sponsors
Rep. Roz Peterson [R] | Rep. Dave Baker [R] | Rep. Jennifer Schultz [D] | Rep. Tony Albright [R] |
Rep. Dario Anselmo [R] | Rep. Rena Moran [D] | Rep. Connie Bernardy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | House | Author added Bernardy. |
2018-03-28 | House | Author added Moran. |
2018-03-26 | House | Author added Anselmo |
2018-03-21 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Finance |
2018-03-08 | House | Author added Albright. |
2018-03-05 | House | Author added Schultz. |
2018-02-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF3015 (Similar To) 2018-04-23 - Author added Franzen