MN HF2959 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Secretary of State Chapter 67 03/17/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 26 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-26 - Secretary of State Chapter 67 03/17/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Rural Finance Authority funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Title
Rural Finance Authority funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeanne Poppe [D] | Rep. Rod Hamilton [R] | Rep. Jeff Brand [D] | Rep. Paul H. Anderson [R] |
Rep. John Poston [R] | Rep. Todd Lippert [D] | Rep. Brad Tabke [D] | Rep. Dale Lueck [R] |
Rep. Debra Kiel [R] | Rep. Mike Sundin [D] | Rep. Tony Jurgens [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House: Passage (Y: 127 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: H.F. NO. 2959 (Y: 53 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-03-05 - House - House: Passage (Y: 127 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House: H.F. NO. 2959 (Y: 53 N: 72 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-26 | Secretary of State Chapter 67 03/17/2020 | |
2020-03-17 | Governor's action Approval | |
2020-03-17 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2020-03-17 | Governor approval | |
2020-03-17 | Presented to Governor | |
2020-03-12 | House | Returned from Senate |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Special Order |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Second reading |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF3408 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF3408, now on General Orders |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Received from House |
2020-03-05 | House | Bill was passed |
2020-03-05 | House | Third reading |
2020-03-04 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Thursday, March 05, 2020 |
2020-03-02 | House | Second reading |
2020-03-02 | House | Committee report, to adopt |
2020-02-26 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means |
2020-02-24 | House | Author added Jurgens |
2020-02-19 | House | Motion did not prevail |
2020-02-19 | House | Motion to suspend rules |
2020-02-13 | House | Authors added Kiel and Sundin |
2020-02-11 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Capital Investment Division |
Same As/Similar To
SF3408 (Similar To) 2020-03-11 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF2959