MN HF2958 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-30 - Author added Fischer
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-30 - Author added Fischer
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Statewide response to substance abuse task force established, reports required, and money appropriated.
Title
Statewide response to substance abuse task force established, reports required, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Dave Pinto [D] | Rep. Kristin Bahner [D] | Rep. Carlos Mariani [D] | Rep. Keith Franke [R] |
Rep. Peter Fischer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | House | Author added Fischer |
2022-03-23 | House | Division action, return to Human Services Finance and Policy |
2022-03-23 | House | Author added Franke |
2022-03-04 | House | Referred by Chair to Behavioral Health Policy Division |
2022-02-21 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Human Services Finance and Policy |
2022-02-14 | House | Author added Mariani |
2022-02-03 | House | Author added Bahner |
2022-02-01 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3112 (Similar To) 2022-02-21 - Author added Dziedzic