MN HF2945 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-19 - Secretary of State Chapter 59
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-19 - Secretary of State Chapter 59
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
City and county criminal history checks modified.
Title
City and county criminal history checks modified.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-12 - Senate - Senate: Third reading Passed (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - House: Passage (Y: 127 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - House - House: Passage (Y: 127 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-19 | Secretary of State Chapter 59 | |
2022-05-19 | Governor's action Approval | |
2022-05-19 | Secretary of State, Filed | |
2022-05-19 | Governor approval | |
2022-05-17 | Presented to Governor | |
2022-05-12 | House | Returned from Senate |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Third reading Passed |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Special Order |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Second reading |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Comm report: Subst. for SF on General Orders SF3214 |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Rules and Administration for comparison with SF3214, now on General Orders |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Introduction and first reading |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Received from House |
2022-03-14 | House | Bill was passed |
2022-03-14 | House | Third reading |
2022-03-10 | House | House rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Monday, March 14, 2022 |
2022-02-17 | House | Author added Moran |
2022-02-10 | House | Second reading |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended |
2022-02-03 | House | Author added Bahner |
2022-02-01 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law |
Same As/Similar To
SF3214 (Similar To) 2022-03-17 - Rule 45; subst. General Orders HF2945