MN HF2944 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Author added Greenman
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Author added Greenman
Pending: House Education Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
English learner programming funding increased, English learner cross subsidy aid added, and money appropriated.
Title
English learner programming funding increased, English learner cross subsidy aid added, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | House | Author added Greenman |
2022-03-14 | House | Authors added Long, Hornstein |
2022-02-10 | House | Author added Jordan |
2022-02-01 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF2932 (Similar To) 2022-02-07 - Referred to Education Finance and Policy