MN HF2943 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - Author added Dettmer.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - Author added Dettmer.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Reunification of parents and children after the parent sexually abuses a child restricted.
Title
Reunification of parents and children after the parent sexually abuses a child restricted.
Sponsors
Rep. Matthew Grossell [R] | Rep. Kathy Lohmer [R] | Rep. John Poston [R] | Rep. Jeff Backer [R] |
Rep. Paul Marquart [D] | Rep. Bob Dettmer [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | House | Author added Dettmer. |
2018-03-28 | House | Author added Marquart. |
2018-03-26 | House | Author added Backer |
2018-03-05 | House | Author added Poston. |
2018-02-26 | House | Author added Lohmer. |
2018-02-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |