MN HF2941 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Author added Slocum.
Pending: House Property Tax and Local Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Author added Slocum.
Pending: House Property Tax and Local Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Property owned by an Indian tribe exemption expanded.
Title
Property owned by an Indian tribe exemption expanded.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | House | Author added Slocum. |
2018-02-23 | House | Referred by Chair to Property Tax and Local Government Finance Division |
2018-02-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Taxes |
Same As/Similar To
SF2458 (Similar To) 2018-03-08 - Author added Lourey