MN HF2931 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Author added Slocum.
Pending: House Commerce and Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-21 - Author added Slocum.
Pending: House Commerce and Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Nonprofit health maintenance organization use of net earnings requirements established.
Title
Nonprofit health maintenance organization use of net earnings requirements established.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | House | Author added Slocum. |
2018-03-01 | House | Authors added Masin and Bly. |
2018-02-22 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Regulatory Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF2728 (Similar To) 2018-02-26 - Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy