MN HF2920 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Introduced on May 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Author added Franson
Pending: House Health and Human Services Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 20 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Author added Franson
Pending: House Health and Human Services Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Minnesota Athletic Act modified.
Title
Minnesota Athletic Act modified.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Author added Franson |
2020-03-02 | House | Author added Boe |
2020-02-27 | House | Author added Swedzinski |
2020-02-26 | House | Author added Pierson |
2020-02-24 | House | Authors added Miller and Moller |
2020-02-20 | House | Authors added Gruenhagen, Brand, Stephenson, and Hansen |
2020-02-19 | House | Author added Anderson |
2019-05-20 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2919 (Similar To) 2020-04-28 - Senate file first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Policy