MN HF2916 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Author added Slocum.
Pending: House Commerce and Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - Author added Slocum.
Pending: House Commerce and Regulatory Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Deadline set for implementation of recipient directives to unsubscribe to unsolicited commercial electronic mail messages.
Title
Deadline set for implementation of recipient directives to unsubscribe to unsolicited commercial electronic mail messages.
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Thissen [D] | Rep. David Bly [D] | Rep. Linda Slocum [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | Author added Slocum. |
2018-02-22 | House | Author added Bly. |
2018-02-20 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce and Regulatory Reform |
Same As/Similar To
SF2677 (Similar To) 2018-02-26 - Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy