MN HF2907 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-07 - Author added Sandell
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-07 - Author added Sandell
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
PFAS prohibited in cookware.
Title
PFAS prohibited in cookware.
Sponsors
Rep. Ami Wazlawik [D] | Rep. Jamie Becker-finn [D] | Rep. Kaohly Her [D] | Rep. Athena Hollins [D] |
Rep. Steve Sandell [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Author added Sandell |
2022-03-18 | House | Division action, to adopt as amended and return to Health Finance and Policy |
2022-03-13 | House | Referred by Chair to Preventive Health Policy Division |
2022-02-28 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Health Finance and Policy |
2022-02-24 | House | Author added Hollins |
2022-02-14 | House | Author added Her |
2022-02-14 | House | Committee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Commerce Finance and Policy |
2022-02-01 | House | Author added Becker-Finn |
2022-01-31 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Environment and Natural Resources Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3327 (Similar To) 2022-02-24 - Authors added Dziedzic; Pappas; Bigham; Dibble