MN HF2903 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on May 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-20 - Author added Loeffler
Pending: House Education Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Schools required to make disposable menstrual products freely available in school restrooms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools required to make disposable menstrual products freely available in school restrooms.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-20HouseAuthor added Loeffler
2019-05-18HouseAuthor added Claflin and Freiberg
2019-05-17HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Education Policy

Same As/Similar To

SF2604 (Similar To) 2019-03-20 - Referred to E-12 Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback