MN HF2896 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Author added Kunesh-Podein.
Pending: House Agriculture Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Mental health counseling and advocate services funding provided, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental health counseling and advocate services funding provided, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-03HouseAuthor added Kunesh-Podein.
2018-04-26HouseAuthor added Flanagan.
2018-03-28HouseAuthor added Ecklund.
2018-03-08HouseAuthor added Slocum.
2018-02-22HouseAuthors added Thissen and Bly.
2018-02-20HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Agriculture Finance

Same As/Similar To

SF2850 (Similar To) 2018-03-01 - Referred to Agriculture, Rural Development, and Housing Finance

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback