MN HF2888 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-18 - Author added Haley.
Pending: House Agriculture Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-18 - Author added Haley.
Pending: House Agriculture Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Mental health counseling for farm families and farm business operators funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Mental health counseling for farm families and farm business operators funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeff Backer [R] | Rep. Tama Theis [R] | Rep. Gregory Davids [R] | Rep. Keith Franke [R] |
Rep. Barb Haley [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | House | Author added Haley. |
2018-03-29 | House | Author added Franke. |
2018-03-08 | House | Author added Davids. |
2018-02-26 | House | Author added Theis. |
2018-02-20 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Agriculture Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SF2555 (Similar To) 2018-02-22 - Referred to Agriculture, Rural Development, and Housing Finance