MN HF2882 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Author added Rasmusson
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Author added Rasmusson
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Red River Basin flood hazard mitigation funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Title
Red River Basin flood hazard mitigation funding provided, bonds issued, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Author added Rasmusson |
2022-02-21 | House | Author added Marquart |
2022-02-10 | House | Author added Backer |
2022-01-31 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Capital Investment |
Same As/Similar To
SF2795 (Similar To) 2022-02-28 - Author added Eken