MN HF288 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Author added Bierman
Pending: House Health and Human Services Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Health plan companies prohibited from removing coverage of insulin or equipment and supplies during an enrollee's contract year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health plan companies prohibited from removing coverage of insulin or equipment and supplies during an enrollee's contract year.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-01HouseAuthor added Bierman
2019-03-15HouseReferred by Chair to Health and Human Services Finance Division
2019-03-14HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Ways and Means
2019-03-11HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Policy
2019-03-07HouseAuthors added Bahner and Bernardy
2019-01-24HouseAuthor added Loeffler
2019-01-22HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Commerce

Same As/Similar To

SF365 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Referred to Commerce and Consumer Protection Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback