MN HF2876 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-2)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-18 - Author added Olson, L.
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-18 - Author added Olson, L.
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Skate park funding program appropriation amended.
Title
Skate park funding program appropriation amended.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-18 | House | Author added Olson, L. |
2022-04-07 | House | Author added Feist |
2022-04-04 | House | Author added Long |
2022-03-30 | House | Author added Schultz |
2022-03-24 | House | Author added Noor |
2022-03-21 | House | Author added Jordan |
2022-03-17 | House | Authors added Boldon and Moller |
2022-03-14 | House | Authors added Theis, Franke |
2022-03-10 | House | Author added Agbaje |
2022-01-31 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Capital Investment |
Same As/Similar To
SF2502 (Similar To) 2022-03-30 - Authors added Johnson Stewart; Dziedzic