MN HF2868 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - Author added Pugh.
Pending: House State Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-09 - Author added Pugh.
Pending: House State Government Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
State agencies required to dedicate a portion of information technology expenditures to cyber security enhancements.
Title
State agencies required to dedicate a portion of information technology expenditures to cyber security enhancements.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Nash [R] | Rep. Peggy Scott [R] | Rep. Tony Albright [R] | Rep. Cindy Pugh [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-09 | House | Author added Pugh. |
2018-03-26 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to State Government Finance |
2018-02-26 | House | Author added Albright. |
2018-02-20 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Government Operations and Elections Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF3764 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Comm report: To pass as amended and re-refer to Finance