MN HF286 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-7)
Status: Engrossed on May 15 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Author stricken Kiel
Pending: Senate Transportation Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Rail carrier minimum crew size required, and criminal penalties imposed.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Rail carrier minimum crew size required, and criminal penalties imposed.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-15 - House - House: Passage (Y: 77 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - House - House: Re-Referral (Y: 56 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-15 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 57 N: 73 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-15 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 47 N: 84 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-15 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 56 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16HouseAuthor stricken Kiel
2019-05-15SenateReferred to Transportation Finance and Policy
2019-05-15SenateIntroduction and first reading
2019-05-15SenateReceived from House
2019-05-15HouseBill was passed
2019-05-15HouseMotion did not prevail
2019-05-15HouseMotion to re-refer Public Safety and Criminal Justice Reform Finance and Policy Division
2019-05-15HouseThird reading
2019-05-15HouseAmendments offered
2019-05-13HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Wednesday, May 15, 2019
2019-03-20HouseSecond reading
2019-03-20HouseCommittee report, to adopt
2019-03-18HouseAuthor added Long
2019-03-07HouseDivision action, return to Ways and Means
2019-03-07HouseAuthor added Freiberg
2019-02-11HouseAuthor stricken Petersburg
2019-01-24HouseAuthors added Dehn and Loeffler
2019-01-22HouseReferred by Chair to Transportation Finance and Policy Division
2019-01-22HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SF263 (Similar To) 2019-01-17 - Referred to Transportation Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=House&f=HF0286&ssn=0&y=2019
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF286&version=0&session=ls91&session_year=2019&session_number=0&format=pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF0286&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10445
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF0286&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10446
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF0286&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10447
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF0286&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10448
Roll Callhttps://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=91&billnum=HF0286&session_number=0&year=2019&id=10449

Bill Comments

feedback