MN HF2859 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-28 - Author added Moller
Pending: House Higher Education Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-28 - Author added Moller
Pending: House Higher Education Finance and Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Assigned student responsibility for state grant program decreased, and existing appropriation increased.
Title
Assigned student responsibility for state grant program decreased, and existing appropriation increased.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-28 | House | Author added Moller |
2022-03-24 | House | Author added Berg |
2022-03-17 | House | Authors added Long, Edelson, and Hassan |
2022-03-14 | House | Author added Reyer |
2022-03-10 | House | Author added Christensen |
2022-02-17 | House | Author added Vang |
2022-02-14 | House | Author added Noor |
2022-02-03 | House | Author added Sandstede |
2022-01-31 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Higher Education Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2894 (Similar To) 2022-03-07 - Author added Hoffman