MN HF2856 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-02 - Referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Omnibus public safety finance and policy bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Omnibus public safety finance and policy bill.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-01 - House - House: (Y: 71 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House: Passage (Y: 92 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 50 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-05-01 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 121 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House: Amendment (Y: 49 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-02SenateReferred to Finance
2018-05-02SenateIntroduction and first reading
2018-05-02SenateReceived from House
2018-05-01HouseBill was passed as amended vote: 92-35
2018-05-01HouseThird reading as amended
2018-05-01HousePoint of order raised, ruled well taken
2018-05-01HouseAmended
2018-05-01HouseAmendments offered
2018-04-26HouseHouse rule 1.21, placed on Calendar for the Day Tuesday, May 1, 2018
2018-04-25HouseSecond reading
2018-04-25HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended
2018-04-19HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Ways and Means
2018-02-20HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Public Safety and Security Policy and Finance

Same As/Similar To

SF2755 (Similar To) 2018-04-19 - Rule 12.10: report of votes in committee

Minnesota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/bill.php?b=House&f=HF2856&ssn=0&y=2017
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF2856&version=0&session=ls90&session_year=2018&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF2856&version=1&session=ls90&session_year=2018&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF2856&version=2&session=ls90&session_year=2018&session_number=0&format=pdf
Texthttps://www.revisor.mn.gov/bills/text.php?number=HF2856&version=3&session=ls90&session_year=2018&session_number=0&format=pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=90&billnum=HF2856&session_number=0&year=2017&id=459
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=90&billnum=HF2856&session_number=0&year=2017&id=460
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=90&billnum=HF2856&session_number=0&year=2017&id=462
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=90&billnum=HF2856&session_number=0&year=2017&id=463
Roll Callhttp://www.house.leg.state.mn.us/votes/votes.asp?ls_year=90&billnum=HF2856&session_number=0&year=2017&id=461

Bill Comments

feedback