MN HF2855 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-2)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Referred by Chair to Capital Investment Division
Pending: House Capital Investment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Disabled Veterans Rest Camp improvement funding provided, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Disabled Veterans Rest Camp improvement funding provided, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29HouseReferred by Chair to Capital Investment Division
2019-04-26HouseAuthor added Poston
2019-04-25HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Ways and Means

Same As/Similar To

SF2863 (Similar To) 2019-05-02 - Referred to Veterans and Military Affairs Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback