MN HF2845 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - Author added Kotyza-Witthuhn
Pending: House Commerce Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-31 - Author added Kotyza-Witthuhn
Pending: House Commerce Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Commerce Fraud Bureau investigation of automobile theft and financial fraud authorized.
Title
Commerce Fraud Bureau investigation of automobile theft and financial fraud authorized.
Sponsors
Rep. Heather Edelson [D] | Rep. Paul Novotny [R] | Rep. Kelly Moller [D] | Rep. John Huot [D] |
Sen. Kelly Morrison [D] | Rep. Carlie Kotyza-Witthuhn [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-31 | House | Author added Kotyza-Witthuhn |
2022-03-10 | House | Author added Morrison |
2022-02-03 | House | Authors added Moller and Huot |
2022-01-31 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Commerce Finance and Policy |