MN HF284 | 2019-2020 | 91st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Author added Bierman
Pending: House Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Insulin products sold in Minnesota cost review authorized by commissioner of health, excessive cost determined, maximum level of reimbursement established for insulin products if necessary, and money appropriated.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insulin products sold in Minnesota cost review authorized by commissioner of health, excessive cost determined, maximum level of reimbursement established for insulin products if necessary, and money appropriated.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-01HouseAuthor added Bierman
2019-03-20HouseAuthor added Persell
2019-03-13HouseCommittee report, to adopt and re-refer to Judiciary Finance and Civil Law Division
2019-03-11HouseCommittee report, to adopt as amended and re-refer to Health and Human Services Policy
2019-01-24HouseAuthors added Loeffler and Dehn
2019-01-22HouseIntroduction and first reading, referred to Commerce

Same As/Similar To

SF364 (Similar To) 2019-01-22 - Referred to Health and Human Services Finance and Policy

Minnesota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback