MN HF2839 | 2021-2022 | 92nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - Author added Keeler
Pending: House Workforce and Business Development Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-07 - Author added Keeler
Pending: House Workforce and Business Development Finance & Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Minneapolis; Indian Health Board Medical and Dental Facility funding provided, and money appropriated.
Title
Minneapolis; Indian Health Board Medical and Dental Facility funding provided, and money appropriated.
Sponsors
Rep. Hodan Hassan [D] | Rep. Jamie Becker-finn [D] | Rep. Jim Davnie [D] | Rep. Mohamud Noor [D] |
Rep. Heather Keeler [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-07 | House | Author added Keeler |
2022-02-21 | House | Author added Noor |
2022-02-17 | House | Author added Davnie |
2022-02-01 | House | Author added Becker-Finn |
2022-01-31 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Workforce and Business Development Finance and Policy |
Same As/Similar To
SF2897 (Similar To) 2022-03-09 - Author added Torres Ray