MN HF2836 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-26 - Motion to return bill to author, motion prevailed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-26 - Motion to return bill to author, motion prevailed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Taconite assistance area modified.
Title
Taconite assistance area modified.
Sponsors
Rep. Rob Ecklund [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-26 | House | Motion to return bill to author, motion prevailed |
2018-03-16 | House | Referred by Chair to Property Tax and Local Government Finance Division |
2018-03-12 | House | Committee report, to adopt and re-refer to Taxes |
2018-02-20 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Education Finance |