MN HF2828 | 2017-2018 | 90th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Author added Schultz.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 20 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Author added Schultz.
Pending: House Health and Human Services Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
General assistance eligibility expanded.
Title
General assistance eligibility expanded.
Sponsors
Rep. Susan Allen [D] | Rep. Paul Thissen [D] | Rep. David Bly [D] | Rep. Fue Lee [D] |
Rep. Karen Clark [D] | Rep. Linda Slocum [D] | Rep. JoAnn Ward [D] | Rep. Jennifer Schultz [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Author added Schultz. |
2018-03-26 | House | Author added Ward |
2018-03-22 | House | Authors added Clark and Slocum. |
2018-03-15 | House | Author added Lee. |
2018-02-22 | House | Authors added Thissen and Bly. |
2018-02-20 | House | Introduction and first reading, referred to Health and Human Services Reform |